MI HB4568 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: fishing; commercial fishing statute; update. Amends secs. 47309, 47310, 47311, 47312, 47313, 47314, 47315, 47316 & 47317 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.47309 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4567'19, HB 4569'19
Title
Natural resources: fishing; commercial fishing statute; update. Amends secs. 47309, 47310, 47311, 47312, 47313, 47314, 47315, 47316 & 47317 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.47309 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4567'19, HB 4569'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 73 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2020-02-06 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 73 Nays 31 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted |
2020-02-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5) |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/08/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-05-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Pauline Wendzel |