MI HB4563 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 112'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management; funds; reference to sales tax exemption for certain agriculture equipment; revise. Amends sec. 2a of 1855 PA 105 (MCL 21.142a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4561'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management; funds; reference to sales tax exemption for certain agriculture equipment; revise. Amends sec. 2a of 1855 PA 105 (MCL 21.142a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4561'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 220 (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 184 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 176 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseAssigned Pa 112'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-26HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 4/25/2018 @ 1:30 Pm
2018-04-26HouseApproved By The Governor 4/25/2018 @ 1:10 Pm
2018-04-19HousePresented To The Governor 4/18/2018 @ 2:14 Pm
2018-04-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-04-12House Roll Call # 220 Yeas 91 Nays 17
2018-04-12HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-03-22HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-03-22HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect
2018-03-22SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 184 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2018-03-22SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-03-22SenateRules Suspended
2018-03-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-03-22SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-03-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-02-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-02-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-02-28SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-06-07SenateReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2017-06-06HouseTransmitted
2017-06-06HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 176 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2017-06-06HouseRead A Third Time
2017-05-31HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-05-31HouseRead A Second Time
2017-05-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-05-24HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-05-03HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2017
2017-05-02HouseReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2017-05-02HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Daire Rendon

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4563
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4563.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4563.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4563.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4563.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0112.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-05-24-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-06-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-28-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-22-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-04-12-035.htm

Bill Comments

feedback