MI HB4552 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: registration plates; disabled veteran registration plate sticker; provide for. Amends secs. 674, 675, 801, 803d, 803f, 805 & 811f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.674 et seq.) & adds sec. 68c.
Title
Vehicles: registration plates; disabled veteran registration plate sticker; provide for. Amends secs. 674, 675, 801, 803d, 803f, 805 & 811f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.674 et seq.) & adds sec. 68c.
Sponsors
Rep. Beau LaFave [R] | Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. Eric Leutheuser [R] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] |
Rep. Steven Marino [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 61 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-02-18 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 61 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-02-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-05-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2019-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: parking
Vehicles: registration plates
Veterans: other
Traffic control: parking
Vehicles: registration plates
Veterans: other