MI HB4551 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Natural resources: funding; recreation passport fee; clarify exemption for totally disabled veterans. Amends secs. 40111, 74116 & 78119 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40111 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4552'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources: funding; recreation passport fee; clarify exemption for totally disabled veterans. Amends secs. 40111, 74116 & 78119 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40111 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4552'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 59 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2020-02-18HouseTransmitted
2020-02-18HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 59 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-02-18HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-06HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-02-06HouseRead A Second Time
2020-01-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-01-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-01-21HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-05-02HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2019
2019-05-02HouseReferred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
2019-05-02HouseRead A First Time
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Beau Lafave

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback