MI HB4546 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 202'13 2013 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 202'13 2013 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; products; potato industry commission; modify provisions for operations and determining assessment rates. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 8 & 9a of 1970 PA 29 (MCL 290.421 et seq.).
Title
Agriculture; products; potato industry commission; modify provisions for operations and determining assessment rates. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 8 & 9a of 1970 PA 29 (MCL 290.421 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Outman [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] | Rep. Robert VerHeulen [R] |
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Paul Muxlow [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 593 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 442 (Y: 73 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 442 (Y: 73 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 202'13 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/18/2013 @ 3:33 Pm 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/17/2013 @ 8:50 Pm 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/16/2013 @ 10:02 Am 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 593 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2013-11-14 | House | Transmitted |
2013-11-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 442 Yeas 73 Nays 37 |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-11-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Amended |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2013-04-17 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2013-04-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Rick Outman |
Same As/Similar To
SB0315 (Same As) 2013-09-17 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Subjects
Agriculture, associations and commissions
Agriculture, marketing
Agriculture, products
State agencies (existing), agriculture and rural development
Trade, other
Agriculture, marketing
Agriculture, products
State agencies (existing), agriculture and rural development
Trade, other