MI HB4532 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: scheduling; reference to August primary election in 1851 PA 156; revise to June primary election. Amends sec. 16c of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.16c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4530'21
Title
Elections: scheduling; reference to August primary election in 1851 PA 156; revise to June primary election. Amends sec. 16c of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.16c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4530'21
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Whitsett [D] | Rep. Ronnie Peterson [D] | Rep. Amos O'Neal [D] | Rep. Julie Calley [R] |
Rep. Graham Filler [R] | Rep. Jewell Jones [D] | Rep. Tenisha Yancey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 Yeas 65 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/17/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Karen Whitsett |