MI HB4532 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Assigned Pa 54'2017 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Assigned Pa 54'2017 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; recording; marital status in instruments conveying or mortgaging real estate; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1915 PA 79 (MCL 565.221).
Title
Property; recording; marital status in instruments conveying or mortgaging real estate; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1915 PA 79 (MCL 565.221).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 246 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Assigned Pa 54'2017 With Immediate Effect |
2017-06-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/15/2017 @ 4:06 Pm |
2017-06-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/15/2017 @ 10:36 Am |
2017-06-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/13/2017 @ 12:02 Pm |
2017-06-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 246 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-05-31 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-05-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2017-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |