MI HB4505 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: physical therapists; licensing process; modify to incorporate physical therapy licensing compact. Amends sec. 17801 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17801) & adds secs. 17820a & 17820b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4504'23
Title
Health occupations: physical therapists; licensing process; modify to incorporate physical therapy licensing compact. Amends sec. 17801 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17801) & adds secs. 17820a & 17820b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4504'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-04-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-05-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Dale Zorn |
Same As/Similar To
HB4504 (Same As) 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Subjects
Health occupations: physical therapists
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements