MI HB4504 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: physical therapists; physical therapy licensure compact; enact. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16188. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4505'23
Title
Health occupations: physical therapists; physical therapy licensure compact; enact. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16188. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4505'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-04-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-05-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-04 | House | Introduced By Representative John Fitzgerald |
Same As/Similar To
HB4505 (Same As) 2024-04-24 - Placed On Third Reading
Subjects
Health occupations: physical therapists
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements