MI HB4505 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 525'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 525'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; compensation; reimbursement for medical procedures and services related to sexual assault medical forensic examinations; modify. Amends sec. 5a of 1976 PA 223 (MCL 18.355a).
Title
Crime victims; compensation; reimbursement for medical procedures and services related to sexual assault medical forensic examinations; modify. Amends sec. 5a of 1976 PA 223 (MCL 18.355a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 948 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 895 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 895 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 525'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:00 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:23 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 4:54 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Roll Call # 948 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 895 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-06-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-04-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2017-04-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Diana Farrington |