MI HB4491 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 195'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 195'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: absent voters; pre-processing of absent voter ballots before election day; provide for, modify provisions regarding absent voter ballot drop boxes, and allow county clerks to initiate the removal of deceased individuals from the qualified voter file. Amends secs. 14b, 24k, 509o, 510, 761d, 765 & 765b of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.14b et seq.).
Title
Elections: absent voters; pre-processing of absent voter ballots before election day; provide for, modify provisions regarding absent voter ballot drop boxes, and allow county clerks to initiate the removal of deceased individuals from the qualified voter file. Amends secs. 14b, 24k, 509o, 510, 761d, 765 & 765b of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.14b et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 465 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | House | Assigned Pa 195'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-11 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/07/2022 04:48 Pm |
2022-10-11 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/07/2022 03:28 Pm |
2022-10-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/03/2022 02:32 Pm |
2022-09-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-28 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2022-09-28 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 451 Yeas 99 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-09-28 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-09-28 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-09-28 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-09-28 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Title Amended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 465 Yeas 32 Nays 1 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/11/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrew Fink |
Subjects
Elections: absent voters
Elections: ballots
Elections: challengers
Elections: election officials
Elections: qualified voter file
Elections: voters
State agencies (existing): other
State agencies (proposed): other
Elections: ballots
Elections: challengers
Elections: election officials
Elections: qualified voter file
Elections: voters
State agencies (existing): other
State agencies (proposed): other