MI HB4482 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; electric utilities; condemnation of property for transmission lines; allow for qualified transmission companies. Amends sec. 5 of 1923 PA 238 (MCL 486.255).
Title
Public utilities; electric utilities; condemnation of property for transmission lines; allow for qualified transmission companies. Amends sec. 5 of 1923 PA 238 (MCL 486.255).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy Policy |
2017-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |
Subjects
Public utilities: electric utilities
Public utilities: natural gas utilities
Public utilities: public service commission
Public utilities: natural gas utilities
Public utilities: public service commission