MI HB4472 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: embezzlement; embezzlement from elder adults; include in crime of embezzlement from vulnerable adults. Amends sec. 174a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.174a).
Title
Crimes: embezzlement; embezzlement from elder adults; include in crime of embezzlement from vulnerable adults. Amends sec. 174a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.174a).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Anthony |