MI HB4462 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Assigned Pa 68'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Assigned Pa 68'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; corridor improvement; capture of increased tax revenue levied under certain millages; prohibit. Amends sec. 3 of 2005 PA 280 (MCL 125.2873).
Title
Economic development; corridor improvement; capture of increased tax revenue levied under certain millages; prohibit. Amends sec. 3 of 2005 PA 280 (MCL 125.2873).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 240 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 111 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 111 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Assigned Pa 68'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-06-19 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/19/2013 @ 3:14 Pm |
2013-06-19 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/19/2013 @ 9:45 Am |
2013-06-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/17/2013 @ 1:45 Pm |
2013-06-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-13 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 240 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2013-06-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-06-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-04-30 | House | Transmitted |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 111 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-03-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/15/2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Farrington |