MI HB4449 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 104'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 104'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: no-fault; allowable expenses; eliminate requirement to reimburse for chiropractic services. Amends sec. 3107b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3107b).
Title
Insurance: no-fault; allowable expenses; eliminate requirement to reimburse for chiropractic services. Amends sec. 3107b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3107b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 247 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Assigned Pa 104'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-07-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 01:02 Pm |
2020-07-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/01/2020 10:14 Am |
2020-06-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/23/2020 10:38 Am |
2020-06-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-06-17 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 247 Yeas 106 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-17 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-06-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking |
2019-12-10 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 Yeas 102 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-04-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2019-04-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-04-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Beth Griffin |