MI HB4444 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 37'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 37'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: public records; publication by electronic means; allow. Amends sec. 11 of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.241).
Title
Civil rights: public records; publication by electronic means; allow. Amends sec. 11 of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.241).
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Rep. Aaron Miller [R] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 98 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 98 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned Pa 37'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/03/2020 03:46 Pm |
2020-03-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/03/2020 12:19 Pm |
2020-02-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/21/2020 01:18 Pm |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2019-05-23 | House | Transmitted |
2019-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 98 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-04-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/11/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2019-04-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |