MI HB4412 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 438'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 438'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; tax tribunal; tribunal procedures; revise, and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 21 & 22 of 1973 PA 186 (MCL 205.721 & 205.722).
Title
Property tax; tax tribunal; tribunal procedures; revise, and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 21 & 22 of 1973 PA 186 (MCL 205.721 & 205.722).
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 877 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 762 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 226 (Y: 82 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 762 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 226 (Y: 82 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 438'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2018 @ 11:30 Am |
2018-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2018 @ 4:42 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2018 @ 2:50 Pm |
2018-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-18 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 877 Yeas 67 Nays 42 |
2018-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 762 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 226 Yeas 82 Nays 25 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2017-06-20 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-03-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/28/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-03-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |