MI HB4411 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Pa 37'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Pa 37'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; eligibility of certain local governmental units to receive a scheduled event license; modify population threshold. Amends sec. 509 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1509).
Title
Liquor; licenses; eligibility of certain local governmental units to receive a scheduled event license; modify population threshold. Amends sec. 509 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1509).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 65 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned Pa 37'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-02-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/21/2018 @ 3:06 Pm |
2018-02-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/20/2018 @ 12:35 Pm |
2018-02-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/12/2018 @ 2:46 Pm |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-06 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 65 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-10-25 | House | Transmitted |
2017-10-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2017-10-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/23/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Curt Vanderwall |