MI HB4410 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Assigned Pa 132'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Assigned Pa 132'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; services or financial assistance; exemptions to JET program participation requirements; clarify. Amends sec. 57f of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.57f).
Title
Human services; services or financial assistance; exemptions to JET program participation requirements; clarify. Amends sec. 57f of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.57f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 318 (Y: 73 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 446 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 446 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | House | Assigned Pa 132'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-09-07 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/6/2011 @ 3:54 Pm |
2011-09-07 | House | Approved By The Governor 9/6/2011 @ 3:04 Pm |
2011-09-07 | House | Presented To The Governor 8/26/2011 @ 11:02 Am |
2011-08-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-08-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-08-24 | House | Roll Call # 318 Yeas 73 Nays 34 |
2011-08-24 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2011-08-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-08-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-08-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 446 Yeas 24 Nays 12 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2011-05-12 | House | Transmitted |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 Yeas 72 Nays 36 |
2011-05-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-05-10 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2011-05-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-03-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/11/2011 |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-03-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Sharon Tyler |
Subjects
Human services, county services
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services
Human services, services or financial assistance
State agencies (existing), human services