MI HB4403 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-11 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-11 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: fair employment practices; penalty for wage and fringe benefit payment violations with the intent to defraud; increase. Amends sec. 15 of 1978 PA 390 (MCL 408.485).
Title
Labor: fair employment practices; penalty for wage and fringe benefit payment violations with the intent to defraud; increase. Amends sec. 15 of 1978 PA 390 (MCL 408.485).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Labor |
2023-04-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-04-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |