MI HB4399 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Rep. Felicia Brabec Replaced Rep. Abdullah Hammoud As Conferee 01/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-26 - Rep. Felicia Brabec Replaced Rep. Abdullah Hammoud As Conferee 01/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: zero budget; department of health and human services; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: zero budget; department of health and human services; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 251 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 200 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 191 (Y: 59 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 200 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 191 (Y: 59 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Rep. Felicia Brabec Replaced Rep. Abdullah Hammoud As Conferee 01/26/2022 |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred To Conference Committee 05/27/2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/27/2021: Sens. Rick Outman, Jim Stamas, Curtis Hertel, Jr. |
2021-05-26 | House | House Conferees Named 05/26/2021: Reps. Mary Whiteford Phil Green Abdullah Hammoud |
2021-05-26 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 251 Yeas 0 Nays 109 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In |
2021-05-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-05-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 200 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-05-12 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 191 Yeas 59 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-05-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended |
2021-05-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |