MI HB4398 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 133'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: zero budget; general government; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: zero budget; general government; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 501 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 631 (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 250 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 199 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 197 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15HouseAssigned Pa 133'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-12-15HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/21/2021 02:08 Pm
2021-12-15HouseApproved By The Governor 12/20/2021 01:40 Pm
2021-12-15HousePresented To The Governor 12/17/2021 11:14 Am
2021-12-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-12-14HouseConference Report Adopted By Senate With Immediate Effect
2021-12-14SenateSenate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 501 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2021-12-14SenateConference Report Received In Senate
2021-12-14HouseRetransmitted
2021-12-14HouseConference Report Adopted Roll Call # 631 Yeas 94 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2021-12-14HouseConference Report Received
2021-12-09HouseRep. Joe Tate Replaced Rep. Terry Sabo As Conferee 12/09/2021
2021-12-09HouseRep. Greg Vanwoerkom Replaced Rep. Ann Bollin As Conferee 12/09/2021
2021-12-09HouseRep. Thomas Albert Replaced Rep. Greg Vanwoerkom As Chair Of Conference 12/09/2021
2021-12-08HouseSen. Curtis Hertel, Jr. Replaced Sen. Jeff Irwin As Conferee 12/08/2021
2021-12-08SenateSen. Curtis Hertel, Jr. Replaced Sen. Jeff Irwin As Conferee 12/08/2021
2021-06-01HouseReferred To Conference Committee 05/27/2021
2021-05-27SenateSenate Named Conferees 05/27/2021: Sens. Roger Victory, Jim Stamas, Jeff Irwin
2021-05-26HouseHouse Conferees Named 05/26/2021: Reps. Greg Vanwoerkom Ann Bollin Terry J. Sabo
2021-05-26HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 250 Yeas 0 Nays 109 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-05-26HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In
2021-05-19HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-05-19HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment
2021-05-19SenateTitle Amended
2021-05-19SenatePassed Roll Call # 199 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-05-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-18SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-05-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-05-13SenateRules Suspended
2021-05-12HouseTransmitted
2021-05-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 197 Yeas 57 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2021-05-12HouseAmended
2021-05-12HouseRead A Third Time
2021-05-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-05-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-12HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted And Amended
2021-05-12HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2021-03-03HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021
2021-03-02HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-03-02HouseRead A First Time
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4398
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0133.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4398-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4398-00C719.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4398-0O408.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4398-6C534579.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4398-992831DB.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4398-B7EBCB51.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4398-B31077C6.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4398-13444789.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4398-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4398-1F1AB9AC.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4398-E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4398-N.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-11-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-12-042.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-19-045.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-26-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-14-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-14-099.htm

Bill Comments

feedback