MI HB4380 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-3)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-11 - Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs
Pending: Senate Local, Urban & State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-11 - Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs
Pending: Senate Local, Urban & State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers; ethics; legislators applying for or receiving certain grants from the state; prohibit. Amends sec. 2 of 1968 PA 318 (MCL 15.302).
Title
Public employees and officers; ethics; legislators applying for or receiving certain grants from the state; prohibit. Amends sec. 2 of 1968 PA 318 (MCL 15.302).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs | |
2010-02-10 | Transmitted | |
2010-02-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 101 Nays 2 | |
2010-02-10 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-02-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-02-10 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2010-02-10 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2010-02-09 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Printed Bill Filed 02/20/2009 | |
2009-02-19 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2009-02-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-19 | Introduced By Representative Sarah Roberts |