MI HB4378 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 193'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 193'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; interior design; regulation of interior designers; repeal. Repeals sec. 601a of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.601a).
Title
Occupations; interior design; regulation of interior designers; repeal. Repeals sec. 601a of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.601a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 346 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 346 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 331 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 58 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 346 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 331 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 58 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 193'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/24/2014 @ 9:03 Am |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2014 @ 4:40 Pm |
2014-06-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/10/2014 @ 11:40 Am |
2014-06-05 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-05 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-06-05 | House | Roll Call # 346 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2014-06-05 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-03 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-03 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 331 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-03-21 | House | Transmitted |
2013-03-21 | House | Title Amended |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 58 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-03-07 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/07/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-03-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine |