MI HB4352 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Assigned Pa 13'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Assigned Pa 13'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: pharmacists; disclosure of prescription drug prices to consumers; allow, and prohibit pharmacies and pharmacists from entering into certain contracts. Amends sec. 17757 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17757) & adds sec. 17757b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4351'21
Title
Health occupations: pharmacists; disclosure of prescription drug prices to consumers; allow, and prohibit pharmacies and pharmacists from entering into certain contracts. Amends sec. 17757 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17757) & adds sec. 17757b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4351'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 58 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 76 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 76 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned Pa 13'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-02-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 02/23/2022 11:24 Am |
2022-02-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 02/23/2022 09:44 Am |
2022-02-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/22/2022 09:30 Am |
2022-02-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-02-16 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2022-02-16 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 58 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-02-16 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-02-16 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-02-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title Amended |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-03-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 76 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Sue Allor |