MI HB4347 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health: pharmaceuticals; reports on certain costs and other information associated with prescription drugs; require manufacturers of prescription drugs to file with the department. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4353'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health: pharmaceuticals; reports on certain costs and other information associated with prescription drugs; require manufacturers of prescription drugs to file with the department. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4353'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 82 (Y: 100 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-03-24HouseTransmitted
2021-03-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 82 Yeas 100 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2021-03-24HouseRead A Third Time
2021-03-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-03-23HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended
2021-03-23HouseRead A Second Time
2021-03-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-03-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-02-25HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2021-02-24HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced By Representative Angela Witwer

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4347
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4347.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4347.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4347-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-630EA5C5.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-D2EDB076.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-2811A52E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-5C24BD17.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-18E50282.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-323D8D82.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-A387DA40.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-26146211.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-B9E8D98C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4347-3C71DFF7.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-11-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-24-027.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback