MI HB4325 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Assigned Pa 67'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Assigned Pa 67'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; producers; continuing education credit carryover system for insurance producers; provide for, and revise valuation standards for certain individual annuity and pure endowment contracts. Amends secs. 835a, 1204a & 1204c of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.835a et seq.) & repeals sec. 1204b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1204b).
Title
Insurance; producers; continuing education credit carryover system for insurance producers; provide for, and revise valuation standards for certain individual annuity and pure endowment contracts. Amends secs. 835a, 1204a & 1204c of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.835a et seq.) & repeals sec. 1204b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1204b).
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 219 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 75 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 75 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Assigned Pa 67'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-07-12 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/30/2017 @ 10:38 Am |
2017-07-12 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/29/2017 @ 9:20 Am |
2017-07-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/26/2017 @ 10:30 Am |
2017-06-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-06-20 | House | Roll Call # 219 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-06-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmitted |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 75 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-04-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2017-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |