MI HB4320 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Assigned Pa 129'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Assigned Pa 129'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; school vehicles; requirement for driver of school bus to stop at certain railroad track grade crossings; revise. Amends sec. 57 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1857).
Title
Transportation; school vehicles; requirement for driver of school bus to stop at certain railroad track grade crossings; revise. Amends sec. 57 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1857).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 116 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 116 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | House | Assigned Pa 129'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-07-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/15/2015 @ 4:48 Pm |
2015-07-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/15/2015 @ 11:02 Am |
2015-07-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/7/2015 @ 9:45 Am |
2015-07-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 07/01/2015 |
2015-07-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-07-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2015-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 116 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2015-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-03-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/12/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Aric Nesbitt |