MI HB4298 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; electric utilities; electric choice; eliminate, prohibit self-implementation of rate increases, and require utilities to utilize a competitive bid process. Amends title & secs. 6a, 6b, 6l, 6m, 6s, 10, 10a, 10c, 10e, 10g, 10q, 10t & 10y of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.6a et seq.); adds sec. 6t & repeals secs. 10f, 10u, 10x & 10bb of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.10f et seq.).
Title
Public utilities; electric utilities; electric choice; eliminate, prohibit self-implementation of rate increases, and require utilities to utilize a competitive bid process. Amends title & secs. 6a, 6b, 6l, 6m, 6s, 10, 10a, 10c, 10e, 10g, 10q, 10t & 10y of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.6a et seq.); adds sec. 6t & repeals secs. 10f, 10u, 10x & 10bb of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.10f et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-9 (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-9 |
2015-03-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/06/2015 |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy Policy |
2015-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Aric Nesbitt |
Subjects
Public utilities: electric utilities
Public utilities: public service commission
Public utilities: rates
Public utilities: public service commission
Public utilities: rates