MI HB4288 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Assigned Pa 36'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Assigned Pa 36'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; other; jurisdiction to establish a support order in certain circumstances under uniform interstate family support act (UIFSA); modify. Amends sec. 204 of 2015 PA 255 (MCL 552.2204).
Title
Family law; other; jurisdiction to establish a support order in certain circumstances under uniform interstate family support act (UIFSA); modify. Amends sec. 204 of 2015 PA 255 (MCL 552.2204).
Sponsors
Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 63 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 63 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Assigned Pa 36'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-05-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/23/2017 @ 10:46 Am |
2017-05-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/23/2017 @ 8:28 Am |
2017-05-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/18/2017 @ 12:44 Pm |
2017-05-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-05-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-03-30 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 63 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/01/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |