MI HB4282 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; construction; licensure of persons engaged in certain occupations related to residential building and contracting; eliminate and clarify licensing requirements for residential builders. Amends secs. 411, 601, 2401, 2402, 2403, 2404, 2404b, 2404c, 2407, 2410, 2411 & 2412 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.411 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4281'15
Title
Occupations; construction; licensure of persons engaged in certain occupations related to residential building and contracting; eliminate and clarify licensing requirements for residential builders. Amends secs. 411, 601, 2401, 2402, 2403, 2404, 2404b, 2404c, 2407, 2410, 2411 & 2412 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.411 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4281'15
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Pat Somerville [R] |
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 (Y: 66 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-09-22 | House | Transmitted |
2016-09-22 | House | Title Amended |
2016-09-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 Yeas 66 Nays 40 |
2016-09-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-09-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-03-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/05/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2015-03-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Ray Franz |
Subjects
Occupations: construction
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: residential builders
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: residential builders
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs