MI HB4257 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Re-referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: House Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

State agencies (existing): executive office; contents and reporting of certain memoranda of understanding; modify. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies (existing): executive office; contents and reporting of certain memoranda of understanding; modify. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 580 (Y: 70 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 450 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 449 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 152 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseRe-referred To Committee On Oversight
2021-12-15HouseVetoed By The Governor 12/23/2021
2021-12-14HousePresented To The Governor 12/14/2021 09:40 Am
2021-12-07HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-12-07HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 580 Yeas 70 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2021-12-07HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-11-30HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-11-30HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1)
2021-11-30SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2021-11-30SenatePassed Roll Call # 450 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-11-30SenateVote Reconsidered
2021-11-30SenatePassed Roll Call # 449 Yeas 24 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
2021-11-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-11-10SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-11-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-09-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-09-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-09-29SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-04-28SenateReferred To Committee On Oversight
2021-04-27HouseTransmitted
2021-04-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 152 Yeas 59 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-04-27HouseRead A Third Time
2021-04-22HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-04-22HouseRead A Second Time
2021-04-15HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-04-15HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-02-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/16/2021
2021-02-16HouseReferred To Committee On Oversight
2021-02-16HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Steven Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4257
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4257.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4257.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4257.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4257.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4257-00B715.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4257-C334820C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4257-0377DD0A.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4257-37360418.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4257-B5FBCD70.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4257-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4257-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-15-031.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-27-035.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-09-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-11-30-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-07-099.htm

Bill Comments

feedback