MI HB4250 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Presented To The Governor 05/25/2023 10:19 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Presented To The Governor 05/25/2023 10:19 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: violations; penalties for operating a vehicle while sending or receiving a message on an electronic wireless device; enhance. Amends sec. 602b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.602b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4251'23, HB 4252'23
Title
Traffic control: violations; penalties for operating a vehicle while sending or receiving a message on an electronic wireless device; enhance. Amends sec. 602b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.602b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4251'23, HB 4252'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 225 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/25/2023 10:19 Pm |
2023-05-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2023-05-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 103 Yeas 71 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-05-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2023-05-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 225 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-05-02 | House | Transmitted |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 68 Nays 39 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-05-02 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted |
2023-04-25 | House | Postponed For The Day |
2023-04-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2023-04-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2023-03-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2023 |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar |