MI HB4240 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: forfeiture; disposition of funds from civil asset forfeiture; clarify. Amends sec. 4708 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4708).
Title
Criminal procedure: forfeiture; disposition of funds from civil asset forfeiture; clarify. Amends sec. 4708 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4708).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 332 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 332 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-06-15 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-15 | House | Passed Roll Call # 332 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-15 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2021-06-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 Yeas 106 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/11/2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |