MI HB4218 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Assigned Pa 12'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Assigned Pa 12'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; juvenile justice services; qualifications for direct care worker of a juvenile court-operated residential care facility; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 14d.
Title
Juveniles; juvenile justice services; qualifications for direct care worker of a juvenile court-operated residential care facility; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 14d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned Pa 12'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/6/2018 @ 1:02 Pm |
2018-02-06 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/6/2018 @ 10:08 Am |
2018-01-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/29/2018 @ 12:11 Pm |
2018-01-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-01-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-01-24 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-01 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-11-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-10-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Eric Leutheuser |