MI HB4213 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 89'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 89'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; drinking age; obtaining court order before nonconsensual preliminary chemical breath testing of a minor; require. Amends sec. 703 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1703).
Title
Liquor; drinking age; obtaining court order before nonconsensual preliminary chemical breath testing of a minor; require. Amends sec. 703 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1703).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 59 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 59 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Assigned Pa 89'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-08-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/12/2017 @ 1:14 Pm |
2017-08-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/12/2017 @ 10:59 Am |
2017-07-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/29/2017 @ 2:52 Pm |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/22/2017 |
2017-07-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-07-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 59 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2017-03-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |
Subjects
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Criminal procedure: warrants
Law enforcement: peace officers
Liquor: drinking age
Criminal procedure: warrants
Law enforcement: peace officers
Liquor: drinking age