MI HB4211 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Banking & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Banking & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; landlord and tenants; 30-day notice of foreclosure of property; require. Amends 1978 PA 454 (MCL 554.631 - 554.641) by adding sec. 10a.
Title
Housing; landlord and tenants; 30-day notice of foreclosure of property; require. Amends 1978 PA 454 (MCL 554.631 - 554.641) by adding sec. 10a.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions | |
2009-03-17 | Transmitted | |
2009-03-17 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 65 Yeas 67 Nays 41 | |
2009-03-17 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-03-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-03-17 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2009-03-17 | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted | |
2009-03-17 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-03-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-02-24 | Recommendation Concurred In | |
2009-02-24 | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Urban Policy | |
2009-02-11 | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2009-02-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced By Representative Shanelle Jackson |