MI HB4174 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-18)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education: occupational schools; occupational school regulations; exempt certain apprenticeship programs. Amends sec. 1a of 1943 PA 148 (MCL 395.101a).
Title
Education: occupational schools; occupational school regulations; exempt certain apprenticeship programs. Amends sec. 1a of 1943 PA 148 (MCL 395.101a).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2019-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Ben Frederick |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4174 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4174.htm |