MI HB4162 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Assigned Pa 34'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Assigned Pa 34'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; requirement for installation and repair of elevators by elevator journeymen; modify for installation and repair of residential lifts. Amends sec. 2 of 1976 PA 333 (MCL 338.2152). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4163'15
Title
Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; requirement for installation and repair of elevators by elevator journeymen; modify for installation and repair of residential lifts. Amends sec. 2 of 1976 PA 333 (MCL 338.2152). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4163'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | House | Assigned Pa 34'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/21/2015 @ 2:25 Pm |
2015-05-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/21/2015 @ 8:44 Am |
2015-05-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/19/2015 @ 9:35 Am |
2015-05-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2015-03-11 | House | Transmitted |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 62 Nays 47 |
2015-03-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-03-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-02-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/11/2015 |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2015-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Aric Nesbitt |
Subjects
Occupations: construction
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: mechanical contractors
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: mechanical contractors