MI HB4161 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Assigned Pa 28'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Assigned Pa 28'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; other; definition of brandish; provide for. Amends sec. 222 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.222). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4160'15
Title
Weapons; other; definition of brandish; provide for. Amends sec. 222 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.222). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4160'15
Sponsors
Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Lee Chatfield [R] | Rep. Laura Cox [R] |
Rep. Thomas Hooker [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] |
Sen. Ricky Outman [R] | Sen. John Bizon [R] | Sen. James Runestad [R] | Rep. Edward Canfield [R] |
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Sen. Michael Webber [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] | Rep. David Maturen [R] |
Rep. John Kivela [D] | Rep. Derek Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 110 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Assigned Pa 28'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/12/2015 @ 5:17 Pm |
2015-05-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/12/2015 @ 10:12 Am |
2015-05-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/8/2015 @ 10:04 Am |
2015-04-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-04-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-04-30 | House | Roll Call # 110 Yeas 108 Nays 2 |
2015-04-30 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-04-29 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-04-29 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | Transmitted |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 Yeas 108 Nays 2 |
2015-02-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/06/2015 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |