MI HB4156 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; possession and operation of electrical devices designed to temporarily incapacitate persons; allow for holders of concealed weapons permits. Amends sec. 224a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.224a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4155'09, HB 4164'09
Title
Law enforcement; other; possession and operation of electrical devices designed to temporarily incapacitate persons; allow for holders of concealed weapons permits. Amends sec. 224a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.224a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4155'09, HB 4164'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-04-28 | Re-referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-02-17 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-02-05 | Printed Bill Filed 02/05/2009 | |
2009-02-04 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-02-04 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-04 | Introduced By Representative Goeff Hansen |