MI HB4145 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure: injunctions; extreme risk protection order act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4146'23, HB 4147'23
Title
Civil procedure: injunctions; extreme risk protection order act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4146'23, HB 4147'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-04-13 | House | Transmitted |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-04-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-04-13 | House | Substitute (h-7) Adopted |
2023-04-13 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted |
2023-04-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5) |
2023-03-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Ranjeev Puri |