MI HB4137 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation: other; reporting estimate of amount of use tax forgone; modify to reflect change in use tax act. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 72 (MCL 21.276). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4253'23
Title
Taxation: other; reporting estimate of amount of use tax forgone; modify to reflect change in use tax act. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 72 (MCL 21.276). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4253'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 (Y: 85 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-03-16 | House | Transmitted |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 Yeas 85 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2023-03-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-03-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2023-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom |
Same As/Similar To
HB4253 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Assigned Pa 21'23 With Immediate Effect