MI HB4134 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: other; precinct size; increase, allow precinct consolidation at certain elections, and require clerks to maintain a permanent absent voter list. Amends secs. 658, 659 & 661 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.658 et seq.) & adds sec. 759e.
Title
Elections: other; precinct size; increase, allow precinct consolidation at certain elections, and require clerks to maintain a permanent absent voter list. Amends secs. 658, 659 & 661 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.658 et seq.) & adds sec. 759e.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Bollin [R] | Rep. Sarah Lightner [R] | Rep. Richard Steenland [D] | Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] |
Rep. Brad Paquette [R] | Rep. Pauline Wendzel [R] | Rep. Kara Hope [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 79 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-03-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 79 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/04/2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Ann Bollin |
Subjects
Elections: election officials
Elections: general election
Elections: other
Elections: precinct boundaries
Elections: primary
Elections: general election
Elections: other
Elections: precinct boundaries
Elections: primary