MI HB4120 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Counties: other; payment period related to contracts or agreements for the purchase of real or personal property for public use; modify for certain counties. Amends sec. 10, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.10).
Title
Counties: other; payment period related to contracts or agreements for the purchase of real or personal property for public use; modify for certain counties. Amends sec. 10, ch. IV of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.10).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 331 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-12-19 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/18/2019 |
2019-12-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/06/2019 09:47 Am |
2019-12-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-03 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 331 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-12-03 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2019-11-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 Yeas 103 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/05/2019 |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Gregory Markkanen |