MI HB4119 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; detainee or prisoner in holding cell, jail, or correctional facility throwing bodily material on certain individuals; prohibit, and provide a penalty. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 411x.
Title
Crimes; other; detainee or prisoner in holding cell, jail, or correctional facility throwing bodily material on certain individuals; prohibit, and provide a penalty. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 411x.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | House | Transmitted |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 Yeas 86 Nays 23 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/31/2017 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-01-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |