MI HB4102 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-15 - Assigned Pa 143'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-15 - Assigned Pa 143'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations bill; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations bill; provide for. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 434 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 354 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 83 (Y: 59 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 354 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 83 (Y: 59 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-15 | House | Assigned Pa 143'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-10-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2015 @ 4:34 Pm |
2015-10-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2015 @ 4:13 Pm |
2015-10-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/15/2015 @ 4:09 Pm |
2015-10-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-10-15 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute H-2 To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Roll Call # 434 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute H-2 To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-14 | House | Retransmitted |
2015-10-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2015-10-14 | House | Roll Call # 354 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2015-10-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Substituted H-2 |
2015-10-14 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2015-10-01 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-10-01 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 Yeas 30 Nays 5 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-04-28 | House | Transmitted |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 83 Yeas 59 Nays 51 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/29/2015 |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Al Pscholka |