MI HB4101 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-18)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising plates for girl scouts of America; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811u.
Title
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising plates for girl scouts of America; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811u.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 649 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2014-12-10 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-10 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-10 | House | Passed Roll Call # 649 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2014-12-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2014-12-09 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2014-12-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/25/2013 |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2013-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Pam Faris |