MI HB4098 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-18)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; driver license; driver responsibility fee; eliminate. Amends sec. 732a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732a).
Title
Traffic control; driver license; driver responsibility fee; eliminate. Amends sec. 732a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732a).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-16 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-09-15 | Transmitted | |
2010-09-15 | Title Amended | |
2010-09-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 Yeas 105 Nays 0 | |
2010-09-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-09-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-09-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-09-15 | Substitute H-5 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-09-15 | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted | |
2010-09-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-03-26 | Recommendation Concurred In | |
2009-03-26 | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-01-27 | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2009 | |
2009-01-22 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-01-22 | Read A First Time | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced By Representative Bettie Scott |