MI HB4088 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration plates; "Gold Star Family" registration plates; create. Amends sec. 803e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803e).
Title
Vehicles; registration plates; "Gold Star Family" registration plates; create. Amends sec. 803e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803e).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2011-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2011-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2011-05-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-04-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-04-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2011-01-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/19/2011 |
2011-01-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-01-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-01-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Bob Genetski |